skip to content

Pacheco Claudio, Christine

CPSO#: 100098

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 29 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2016