skip to content

Pace-Asciak, Pia Zahra

CPSO#: 97207

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Sunnyside West Building, 230
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6659
Fax: 416-530-6742 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pia Pace-Asciak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pace-Asciak ( CPSO# 97207 )

Business Address:
410-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: 289-856-9933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:07 Mar 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PIA ZAHRA PACE-ASCIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE-ASCIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 24 Feb 2012
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2020