skip to content

Woo, Paul Chung Yue

CPSO#: 23559

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Fukien

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Woo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Health and Wellness Centre at MSC C1-11211 Yonge Street Richmond Hill ON L4S 0E9
Date Received: 30 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019