skip to content

Mathew, Paul Kavanakudy

CPSO#: 83622

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B4D - 350 Conestoga Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: (519) 624-1117 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Altum Health
University Health Network
101 - 745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Altum Health
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toyota Motor Manufacturing Canada
Health Centre
1055 Fountain St N
Cambridge ON  N3H 5K2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mathew ( CPSO# 83622 )
Dr. J. Mathew ( CPSO# 89787 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
Suite B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 624-5999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL KAVANAKUDY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Aug 2005 to 02 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2019