skip to content

Liwanpo, Paul Ting Fen

CPSO#: 29935

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. T. F. Liwanpo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Liwanpo ( CPSO# 29935 )

Business Address:
35 Wolf Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 1S5
Phone Number: (519) 842-6056

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Feb 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 25, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Ting Fen Liwanpo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 25, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Liwanpo engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Liwanpo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)