skip to content

Law, Peter

CPSO#: 69001

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 Harding Blvd. W.
Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-0594
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

679 Davis Drive
Suite. 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-1313
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

125 Pedersen Dr.
Units 3, 4, 5
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 751-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

955 Major Mackenzie Dr.
Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (289) 553-6336
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2001