skip to content

Lau, Pamela Pek-Shan

CPSO#: 95756

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Lau, Pamela Pekshan (used until: 21 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214-6633 Highway 7 E
Markham Medical Centre
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: 905-294-2290
Fax: 905-294-0029 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

157 Yonge St
Patient Networks
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Canada
Phone: 416-362-8822
Fax: 416-362-8877
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Weight Management Centre of
401- 286 Sanford Ave N
Hamilton ON  L8L 6A1
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau ( CPSO# 95756 )

Business Address:
304-2175 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto Metabolic Clinic
North York ON  M2J 1W8

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

9980 Kennedy Road, Suite C9
Markham, ON   L6C 0M4
Tel: 905-888-7099
Fax: 905-888-7098
Date Received: 20 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oak Valley Health - Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA PEK-SHAN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013