skip to content

Kundhal, Prabhsharan Singh

CPSO#: 81026

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 792-6223
Fax: (866) 233-9346 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1131 Leslie St
North York ON  M3C 2J6
Canada
Phone: 4163607360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P.S. Kundhal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundhal ( CPSO# 81026 )

Business Address:
303 - 2250 Bovaird Drvie East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-6223


Corporation Name: J.L. Platt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kundhal ( CPSO# 81026 )
Dr. J. Platt ( CPSO# 90996 )

Business Address:
104-1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Business Address:
Unit 303
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 946-5439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRABHSHARAN SINGH KUNDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009