skip to content

Gonzalez, Patricia

CPSO#: 83951

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
2B - 2nd Floor
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3885
Fax: (905) 592-2325 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gonzalez ( CPSO# 83951 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
2nd Floor, Suite 2B
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3885

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICIA GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 03 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008