skip to content

Garfinkel, Paul Earl

CPSO#: 22710

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dorian & Garfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Garfinkel ( CPSO# 22710 )
Dr. B. Dorian ( CPSO# 30389 )

Business Address:
77 Madison Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S3
Phone Number: (416) 531-2735

Business Address:
Suite 820
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2021