skip to content

Enright, Paula Dawn

CPSO#: 82638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
Room AB169
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137978899 Ext. 14555 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Enright ( CPSO# 82638 )
Dr. S. English ( CPSO# 84955 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAULA DAWN ENRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
CF - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007