skip to content

Owsianik, Walter Dale John

CPSO#: 30561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 1J9
Phone: (905) 529-8558
Fax: (905) 577-6306 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Owsianik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Owsianik ( CPSO# 30561 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
605 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 1J9
Phone Number: (905) 529-8558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALTER DALE JOHN OWSIANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWSIANIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2019