skip to content

Owen, Robert Lindsay

CPSO#: 23914

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003