skip to content

Owen, Richard John

CPSO#: 87593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Aug 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel-Dieu Grace Health Care
Geriatric Mental Health
1453 Prince Rd.
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: 1-519-257-5105 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Owen ( CPSO# 87593 )

Business Address:
LHSC South Street Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite A2-511
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6503

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active
 
            1.    Dr. Richard John Owen may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Owen holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when Dr. Owen no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.