skip to content

Owen, James Richard Mark

CPSO#: 93015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellesley-St. James Town Health Cen
St. Michael's - Unity Health Toront
95 Homewood Avenue
Toronto ON  M4Y 1J4
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Owen ( CPSO# 93015 )

Business Address:
Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Business Address:
95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON  M4Y 1J4
Phone Number: 4168673728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES RICHARD MARK OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012