skip to content

Overduin, Oluwatola

CPSO#: 90279

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Afolabi, Oluwatola (used until: 17 Mar 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-920 King St S
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: (519) 880-4485
Fax: (226) 215-3201 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medpoint Health Care Centre
Citi Plaza
355 Wellington, Suite 233
London ON  N2G 1G4
Canada
Phone: 519-432-1919 Ext. 230
Fax: (519) 432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Overduin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: O. Overduin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Overduin ( CPSO# 90279 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seen in Brantford, Guelph, Kitchener/Waterloo, and Stratford can call 519-880-4485 for questions about medical records.
Date Received: 27 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:19 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUWATOLA OVERDUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OVERDUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 11 Mar 2009 to 25 Mar 2009
EL - Plastic Surgery

Western University, 18 Apr 2011 to 29 Apr 2011
EL - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
EL - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012