skip to content

Ouzounian, Maral

CPSO#: 85765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4218
Fax: (416) 340-4580 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maral Ouzounian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ouzounian ( CPSO# 85765 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 4N-464
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4218

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARAL OUZOUNIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUZOUNIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013