skip to content

Outred, James Thomas

CPSO#: 18175

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 28-Oct-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2004