skip to content

Ouellette, Michael Kevin

CPSO#: 85531

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pikangikum Nursing Station
General Delivery
Pikangikum ON  P0V 2L0
Phone: (807) 773-5550
Fax: (807) 773-5298 Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KEVIN OUELLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUELLETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2009