skip to content

Ouellette, Jean-Paul

CPSO#: 23809

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Orleans Clinic of Orthopaedic Medicine Unit 206 2555 St Joseph Boulevard Orleans, ON K1C 1S6
Date Received: 20 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017