skip to content

Ouchterlony, Mary Donna

CPSO#: 21434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Collins, Mary Donna Fleming (used until: 15 Sep 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Michael's Hospital Head Injury Clinic 30 Bond Street Toronto, Ontario M5B1W8
Date Received: 27 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY DONNA OUCHTERLONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OUCHTERLONY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968