skip to content

Ou Hingwan, Gilbert

CPSO#: 22081

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gilbert Ou Hingwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011