skip to content

Ott, Monica Sophia

CPSO#: 87037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Gp Headquarters
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-901-9531 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Arnprior&District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: 613-623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monica Ott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2013
Corporation Name: Monica Ott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ott ( CPSO# 87037 )

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA SOPHIA OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 14 Jul 2007
EL - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2007
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008