skip to content

Otoo, Andrew Amukwei

CPSO#: 27851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Feb 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd. Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca or 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW AMUKWEI OTOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTOO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1975
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Jan 1997
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Feb 1997

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1996
Summary:

In June 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Otoo guilty of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1. Dr. Otoo was to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. Dr. Otoo(s certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of three months, commencing within 60 days of the Order becoming final.

3. The last two months of the suspension is to be suspended provided that Dr. Otoo complete at his own expense, to the satisfactory of the Registrar, within 8 months of the Order becoming final;

(a) The College(s course on communication skills with the particular emphasis on gender sensitivity and patient autonomy; and

(b) A dialogue with a medical ethecist acceptable to the Registrar for a minimum of five- two hour sessions, which sessions shall include counselling patients, who are victims of domestic abuse and the issue of the paternalism in the doctor/patient relationship.

4. A copy of the Committee(s reasons for decision is to be delivered to the provider of each course.

5. If the said conditions are not met within the said eight months, the remaining two months suspension shall be served starting no later than 8 months from the Order becoming final.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 21, 1995