skip to content

Osmun, William Edward

CPSO#: 31652

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Feb 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. E. Osmun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Osmun ( CPSO# 31652 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM EDWARD OSMUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988