skip to content

Osmond, Allison Leanne

CPSO#: 93046

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the hospital where they were attended: Toronto General Hospital (Tel: 416-946-4501 ext. 4711) or Lakeridge Health Oshawa (Tel: 905-576-8711).
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 11 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 11 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2019