skip to content

Osman, Elrasheed Sid Ahmed El Hag

CPSO#: 100139

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2017
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Oct 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
955 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 766-7300 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health SC
Vascular Surgery Division
Dept of Surgery
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Suite 200
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Canada
Phone: 807-345-5056
Fax: 888-504-1696
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Sudan

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jul 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Elrasheed Sid Ahmed Elhag Osman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine,
                        in which Dr. Osman holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Osman  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Osman's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Osman's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 11, 2017, and expires on June 30,
                  2024. Upon renewal of Dr. Osman's academic appointment at the Northern
                  Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to
                  the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.