skip to content

Osborne, Ronald Julian

CPSO#: 21559

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1998