skip to content

Osborn, Alexander Justin

CPSO#: 94173

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Voice Clinic
Suite 2003
180 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z8
Phone: (647) 361-8182
Fax: (647) 361-8189 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Otolaryngology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:14 May 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active
             Dr.   Alexander   Justin   Osborn   may   practise  medicine  independently  in
            otolaryngology.