skip to content

Osagie, Ofure Elsie

CPSO#: 94506

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Lagos, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
226 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 637-7617
Fax: (519) 637-7428 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O.E. Osagie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Osagie ( CPSO# 94506 )

Business Address:
226 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 637-7617

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OFURE ELSIE OSAGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSAGIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012