skip to content

Orr, James Frederick

CPSO#: 24724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone: (905) 306-9229 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James F. Orr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK ORR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Oct 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1974