skip to content

Orpin, John Alexander

CPSO#: 22454

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Feb 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 1989

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1987
Summary:

 In August 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Orpin guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Orpin(s licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 24 Nov 1988
Hearing Date(s): 10 Aug 1987