skip to content

Orner, Abraham Isaac

CPSO#: 84797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Family Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Orner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orner ( CPSO# 84797 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Family Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
2828 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 3A7
Phone Number: (647) 715-5711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC ORNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009