skip to content

Orlov, Steven Rostislav

CPSO#: 93154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Dr
Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: 416-222-6160 Ext. 269
Fax: 416-645-1978 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wharton Medical Clinic
658 Danforth Ave, Suite 402
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Canada
Phone: 1-833-962-5359
Fax: 888-825-1505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Orlov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Orlov ( CPSO# 93154 )

Business Address:
Suite 19
1118 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Business Address:
Suite 402
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9

Business Address:
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN ROSTISLAV ORLOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORLOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014