skip to content

Oraif, Ayman Mohammed Kheder

CPSO#: 90162

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 15 Jan 2009 to 11 Feb 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2010 to 07 Apr 2010
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Western University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Western University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Western University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015