skip to content

Oqab, Zardasht

CPSO#: 98945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZARDASHT OQAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OQAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019