skip to content

Opyr, Oksana Lubomyrivna

CPSO#: 89767

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Dec 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education: Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
805-1243 Islington ave
Toronto ON  M8X1Y9
Phone: (416) 766-5888
Fax: (416) 766-5885 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

767 Royal York Rd
Ontario
Toronto ON  M8Y 2T3
Canada
Phone: 4162397365
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Opyr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Opyr ( CPSO# 89767 )

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Business Address:
1243 Islington Ave Suite 805
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: 4167665888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Dec 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 16 Dec 2022 Active
 As from December 16, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Oksana Lubomyrivna Opyr in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Opyr to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. OKSANA LUBOMYRIVNA OPYR
("Dr. Opyr")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Opyr, certificate of registration number 89767, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised concerns about my care of a patient in my family practice, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-390256-M8T5X6 (the "Investigation"). 

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Opyr, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Opyr, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	University of Toronto's Medical Record-Keeping Program;

(ii)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:            

1.	2017 Comprehensive Update of the Canadian Cardiovascular Society Guidelines for the Management of Heart Failure: https://cardiacsciencesmb.ca/wp-content/uploads/2021/03/PIIS0828282X1730973X.pdf;

2.	Hypertensive Emergencies: https://bestpractice.bmj.com/topics/en-gb/27;

3.	Medical Records Documentation, College policy; and

4.	Managing Tests, College policy.

(b)	I, Dr. Opyr, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Opyr, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Opyr, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(12)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(13)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into Dr. Opyr's care of a patient in their family practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Opyr will engage in professional education in the assessment, management and follow up of hypertension and congestive heart failure, medical record-keeping, and test management.

(c)	I, Dr. Opyr, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Opyr, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Opyr, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Opyr, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
 
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Oksana Lubomyrivna Opyr to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 16, 2022.
 
Following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation into Dr. Opyr’s care of a patient in their family practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Opyr will engage in professional education in the assessment, management and follow up of hypertension and congestive heart failure, medical record-keeping, and test management.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)