Opala, Adrian Robert (CPSO#: 98505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  25 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Sep 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellingston St N
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Regional Hospital
Div Physical Med & Rehabilitation
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Adrian Robert Opala may practise physical medicine and rehabilitation
                  at  Regional  Rehabilitation  Centre  and  Hamilton  General  Hospital in
                  Hamilton,  Ontario,  while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Opala's eligibility to take  the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Opala's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by  the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Opala's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 26, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before September 25, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.