skip to content

Ooi, See Wei

CPSO#: 98349

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Dundee, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. See Wei Ooi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 11 Feb 2019 to 17 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2021