skip to content

Oneschuk, Gail Patricia

CPSO#: 30352

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Everest Surgicentre Inc.
1565 Carling Ave, Suite 112
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8R1
Phone: 613-724-3937 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Oneschuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019