skip to content

Omoruyi, Enosakhare Bernard

CPSO#: 91973

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Benin, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
Child & Adolescent /Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: 416 281 7301
Fax: 416 281 7465 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health, Ajax Site
Department of Psychiatry
580 Harwood Avenue South, Ajax, Ont
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905 683 2320 Ext. 13470
Fax: (905) 683-8527
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Omoruyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Omoruyi ( CPSO# 91973 )

Business Address:
RVHS Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Psychiatry
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
RVHS Centenary
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone Number: (416) 281-7301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ENOSAKHARE BERNARD OMORUYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMORUYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011