skip to content

Olupona, Titilayo I

CPSO#: 86791

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Integra Health Center
Exchange Tower, 1320-130 King St
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone: 416 777 9355 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416 5-7 6600
Fax: 416 507 6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Titilayo Olupona Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Olupona ( CPSO# 86791 )

Business Address:
Integra Health Centre
1320 - 130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone Number: (416) 777-9355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TITILAYO I OLUPONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUPONA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014