skip to content

Olufowobi, Olufemi Olugbenga

CPSO#: 89908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 228-2025
Fax: 905-228-3438 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olufemi Olufowobi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Olufowobi ( CPSO# 89908 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 228-2025

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUFEMI OLUGBENGA OLUFOWOBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUFOWOBI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2008

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)