skip to content

Olsson, Larry Sven Morten Daniel

CPSO#: 25521

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Apr 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Larry Olsson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: R R 7 2517 Nixon Road Simcoe, ON N3Y 4K6
Instructions: Patients must provide written consent along with payment for copies of medical records.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014