skip to content

Olsen, Michael

CPSO#: 100891

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Sports Medicine & Rehab
235 Wallace Ave.
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone: 416-703-3525
Fax: 647-343-8073 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Olsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Olsen ( CPSO# 100891)

Business Address:
Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehab
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: (416) 473-9573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL OLSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017