skip to content

Olorunsola, Kehinde

CPSO#: 93295

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Yoruba

Education:University of Vienna, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
111-417 Wellington St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5J5
Phone: (519) 631-3223
Fax: (519) 286-0390 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Olorunsola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Olorunsola ( CPSO# 93295 )

Business Address:
111 - 417 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 631-3223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEHINDE OLORUNSOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLORUNSOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012