skip to content

Olley, Peter Martin

CPSO#: 22446

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1986