skip to content

Oliver Fernandez, Alejandro

CPSO#: 86738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
640 Ross Ave E
Suite F
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 267-1744
Fax: (705) 267-1899 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Oliver Fernandez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oliver Fernandez ( CPSO# 86738 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
640 Ross Avenue East
Suite F
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 267-1744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEJANDRO OLIVER FERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER FERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008