skip to content

Oliveira, Katia Ferreira de

CPSO#: 96199

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Oliveira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Oliveira ( CPSO# 96199 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: 905-683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATIA FERREIRA DE OLIVEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 14 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020