First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |